WY SF0119 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to administration of government; requiring the posting of specified payments on the state auditor's website and the Wyoming public finance and expenditure of funds website; imposing duties on the state auditor and department of administration and information; and providing for effective dates.
Title
State spending transparency.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Edwards [R] | Rep. Chuck Gray [R] | Rep. Garry Piiparinen [R] | Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
Sen. Dennis Biteman [R] | Sen. Brian Boner [R] | Sen. Anthony Bouchard [R] | Sen. Anthony Bouchard [R] |
Sen. Tom James [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | H:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to HR 5-4 |
2019-02-21 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2019-02-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-02-01 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-30 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-29 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |