WY SF0118 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the administration of government; amending the inclusion of federal encumbrances for purposes of calculating fund balances of state funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fund balance calculations-federal encumbrances excluded.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 23 | |
2023-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0008 | |
2023-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0008 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0008 |
2023-02-13 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0008 | |
2023-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-10 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-09 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-08 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-18 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |