WY SF0118 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Died In Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Died In Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to Medicaid; providing for expansion of coverage to low income persons as specified; authorizing a Medicaid demonstration waiver; providing waiver requirements as specified; creating the healthcare reserve account; providing for transfer of appropriated funds as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Medicaid-staged expansion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S10 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0118.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Introduced/SF0118.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2014/Digest/SF0118.htm |