WY SF0117 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-18 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the University of Wyoming; establishing a reclamation and restoration challenge account to be used for funding the Wyoming reclamation and restoration center; specifying program conditions; depositing substituted abandoned mine land funds to the account as specified; providing for use of such funds; repealing previous authority related to the use of the funds; providing for expenditures from the account; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Wyoming reclamation and restoration center.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Rep. Rosie Berger [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Rep. Thomas Lockhart [R] |
Rep. Thomas Lubnau [R] | Sen. Philip Nicholas [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-18 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0031 | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0031 | |
2011-02-16 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0031 | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0031 | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-09 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H02 | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-02 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-28 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S02 | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-18 | Bill Number Assigned |