WY SF0116 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Assigned Chapter Number 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to state parks and cultural resources; requiring uniform procedures, forms, contract provisions and other requirements between the department of state parks and cultural resources and vendors in state parks; requiring rulemaking; specifying applicability; and providing for effective dates.
Title
State parks-vendor contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. William Henderson [R] | Rep. Hans Hunt [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] | Sen. Michael Gierau [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Assigned Chapter Number 66 | |
2019-02-19 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0032 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0032 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0032 |
2019-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0032 | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Concur:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-13 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 52-6-2-0-0 |
2019-02-12 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-11 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-08 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-08 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2019-02-01 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-31 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-28 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-17 | Bill Number Assigned |