WY SF0116 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to operation of motor vehicles; prohibiting use of cell phones by persons operating school district buses; providing exceptions; providing penalties; providing a definition; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School bus drivers-cell phone use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and referred to S08; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-14 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0116.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0116.pdf |