WY SF0115 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - COW:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - COW:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to discrimination; prohibiting discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity as specified; providing an exception; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - House - COW:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-24 - House - COW:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-1-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-1-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - COW:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-1-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-1-0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0 (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-09 - Senate - 2nd Reading:Passed (Y: 11 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - Senate - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | COW:Failed 26-33-1-0-0 |
2015-02-23 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-23 | Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-2-0-1-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2015-02-11 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 24-6-0-0-0 |
2015-02-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-02-06 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-02-03 | Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 | |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-22 | Bill Number Assigned |