WY SF0114 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - 3rd Reading:Failed 25-33-2-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to sales and use taxes; authorizing contracts for payments of sales and use taxes related to the construction of specified facilities; providing for distribution of the payments; providing for a special property tax assessment; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax payments-large facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 25-33-2-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27House3rd Reading:Failed 25-33-2-0-0
2019-02-26House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-25House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-22HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-14HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-14HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-11House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseH09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2019-02-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
2019-02-04HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-02-01Senate3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0
2019-01-31Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-30SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-30SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-30SenateS03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
2019-01-18SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-17 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback