WY SF0109 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Assigned Chapter Number 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Assigned Chapter Number 116
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the protection of constitutional rights; prohibiting the implementation or enforcement of a red flag gun seizure; preempting local law; providing definitions; providing for a civil action; providing a penalty; waiving sovereign immunity; authorizing attorney's fees; authorizing the attorney general to initiate a civil action; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Prohibit Red Flag Gun Seizure Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Concur:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-8-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 10-51-1-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 9-53-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 21-40-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 10-50-2-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment adopted 32-28-2-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 54-8-0-0-0 (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 10-51-1-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 9-53-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 21-40-1-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment failed 10-50-2-0-0 (Y: 10 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - House - Amendment adopted 32-28-2-0-0 (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-2-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | Assigned Chapter Number 116 | |
2024-03-22 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0054 | |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0054 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0054 |
2024-03-07 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0054 | |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Concur:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 54-8-0-0-0 |
2024-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2024-03-01 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-03-01 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2024-02-28 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-20 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | :Refer to S05 - Agriculture |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-2-0-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-13 | Bill Number Assigned |