WY SF0108 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; providing for primary elections allowing any voter to vote for any candidate running; eliminating election of precinct committeemen and committeewomen; providing for the candidates with the two highest votes in the primary to advance to the general election; providing for filling of vacancies in nomination; providing conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-26SenateCommittee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
2013-02-04SenateIntroduced and referred to S07; No report prior to CoW Cutoff
2013-01-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S07
2013-01-14SenateReceived for Introduction
2013-01-11 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback