WY SF0100 | 2018 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 126 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to economic diversification; creating a broadband development program; specifying requirements for providing funds for projects under the program; providing for administration by the Wyoming business council; requiring rules and specifying procedures; providing for the establishment of a broadband advisory council; providing for the position of broadband coordinator; providing appropriations; restricting appropriations as specified; modifying other appropriations; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic diversification-broadband services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 46-13-1-0-0 (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16 Chapter No. 126 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
2018-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number 126
2018-03-16 Governor Signed SEA No. 0036
2018-03-10HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0036
2018-03-09SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0036
2018-03-08 Assigned Number SEA No. 0036
2018-03-08SenateConcur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2018-03-07SenateReceived for Concurrence
2018-03-07House3rd Reading:Passed 46-13-1-0-0
2018-03-06House2nd Reading:Passed
2018-03-05HouseCOW:Passed
2018-03-02HousePlaced on General File
2018-03-02HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2018-03-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations
2018-03-01HouseReceived for Introduction
2018-02-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
2018-02-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2018-02-22SenateCOW:Passed
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on General File
2018-02-22SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2018-02-21Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2018-02-21SenateS09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 27-2-1-0-0
2018-02-14SenateReceived for Introduction
2018-02-13 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback