WY SF0100 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to sales and use tax; changing the refund period for overpayment of sales and use tax; conforming related provisions including retaining records and collecting delinquent taxes; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Sales tax overpayments-refund period.
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Cooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and referred to S03; No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2013-01-09 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Digest/SF0100.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2013/Introduced/SF0100.pdf |