WY SF0099 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 166 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 166 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professions and occupations; amending membership and duties of the state board of pharmacy; amending the rate of compensation received by board members as specified; amending requirements of the Wyoming Pharmacy Act as specified; providing for electronic pharmacist examinations; allowing for electronic memorandum for prescription records; repealing archaic provisions related to the sale of poison by pharmacists; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Pharmacy Act amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Chapter No. 166 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015 | |
2015-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2015-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0066 | |
2015-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0066 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0066 |
2015-03-04 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0066 | |
2015-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 |
2015-03-03 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-03-02 | House | COW:Passed |
2015-02-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2015-02-26 | Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 | |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2015-02-03 | House | Received for Introduction |
2015-02-02 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2015-01-29 | Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0 | |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2015-01-20 | Bill Number Assigned |