WY SF0097 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-04 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; amending nomination procedures for major party candidates, minor party candidates and independent candidates as specified; repealing provisions related to the nomination of independent candidates; making conforming amendments; requiring rulemaking; and providing for effective dates.
Title
Elections-nominations amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0 (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | postponed indefinitely |
2019-01-29 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Do Pass Failed 2-2-1-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |