WY SF0097 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to economic development; providing an appropriation to the revolving investment fund created pursuant to Article XVI, Section 12 of the Wyoming constitution; providing for loans for economic development projects as specified; requiring matching funds; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Large fund economic development loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - H02 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-07 | Governor Signed SEA0062 | |
2014-03-06 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0062 |
2014-03-05 | Assigned Number SEA0062 | |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Did Concur |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-03-05 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-03-03 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-03-03 | House | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-28 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-28 | House | Rereferred to H02 |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-28 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H09 |
2014-02-26 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-25 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-24 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-21 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Rereferred to S02 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-11 | Bill Number Assigned |