WY SF0096 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 78
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health and safety; repealing provisions related to hospital record confidentiality and disclosure; recreating provisions related to medical staff committees as specified; amending references to repealed sections; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal-hospital records and information statutes.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Kinner [R] | Rep. Cyrus Western [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. David Kinskey [R] |
Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 78 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0053 | |
2019-02-22 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0053 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0053 |
2019-02-21 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0053 | |
2019-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0 |
2019-02-21 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-15 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-25 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-23 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-22 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Bill Number Assigned |