WY SF0095 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public utilities; specifying that a certificate of convenience and necessity or an extension of territory shall not be authorized for service provided to a customer in another public utility's territory; requiring the public service commission to order a public utility to cease and desist the provision of service; authorizing the commission to order just compensation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public utilities-service in other territory.
Sponsors
Rep. John Eklund [R] | Rep. Danny Eyre [R] | Rep. Jamie Flitner [R] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] |
Rep. Evan Simpson [R] | Rep. J.D. Williams [R] | Sen. Ogden Driskill [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations 23-6-1-0-0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-15 | Bill Number Assigned |