WY SF0095 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - COW:H Did not consider for COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; creating and providing duties for a Wyoming Colorado River committee; making conforming amendments; requiring a report; providing appropriations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Wyoming Colorado River committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Crank [R] | Rep. John Freeman [D] | Rep. Jerry Paxton [R] | Rep. Albert Sommers [R] |
Sen. Liisa Anselmi-Dalton [D] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-1-1-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | COW:H Did not consider for COW |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-06 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-1-1-0-0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2020-03-02 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-27 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 19-11-0-0-0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | COW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-14 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 29-0-1-0-0 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-10 | Bill Number Assigned |