WY SF0094 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Assigned Chapter Number 154
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to domestic relations; codifying the federal Indian Child Welfare Act as state law; specifying requirements and procedures for the placement of Indian children in shelter care or for adoption; providing a sunset date; making conforming amendments; specifying applicability; requiring rulemaking; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Federal Indian Child Welfare Act codification.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Rep. Sarah Penn [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Affie Ellis [R] |
Sen. Tim Salazar [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Concur:Passed 22-7-2-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-2-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Assigned Chapter Number 154 | |
2023-03-09 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0089 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0089 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0089 |
2023-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0089 | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Concur:Passed 22-7-2-0-0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2023-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-2-0-0 |
2023-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-15 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2023-01-24 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-24 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 20-11-0-0-0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-18 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-11 | Bill Number Assigned |