WY SF0094 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 89 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to payments for educational services; requiring the department of education to pay for the education costs of children placed in psychiatric residential treatment facilities as specified; requiring certification from the department of education as specified; requiring notification by psychiatric residential treatment facilities and school districts; providing requirements for maintaining educational records; allowing districts that continue providing educational services to a student to retain the student in their ADM; requiring individualized learning plans; providing definitions; granting rulemaking authority; specifying payment; providing an appropriation; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment for educational services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 89 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0034
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0034
2016-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0034
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0034
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-29HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-29 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2016-02-23HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-18SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-18 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-17SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-17SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-17 S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-12SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-10 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback