WY SF0093 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Western Interstate Commission for Higher Education (WICHE) repayment program; including veterinary medicine students under WICHE repayment program requirements; providing applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
WICHE repayment program-veterinary medicine students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Governor Vetoed SEA No. 0019 | |
2021-04-05 | Veto Message Received | |
2021-03-30 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2021-03-29 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0019 | |
2021-03-29 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-26 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-25 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-19 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-19 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2021-03-10 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-10 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-08 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-03 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |