WY SF0093 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to wildlife; making legislative findings regarding the need for the game and fish commission to conduct a grizzly bear hunt as specified; authorizing the game and fish commission to hold a grizzly bear hunt or facilitate a relocation as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grizzly bear hunts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Concur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0 (Y: 52 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-15 Assigned Chapter Number 27
2019-02-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0011
2019-02-12HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0011
2019-02-12SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0011
2019-02-11 Assigned Number SEA No. 0011
2019-02-11SenateConcur:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
2019-02-11SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-11House3rd Reading:Passed 52-7-1-0-0
2019-02-08House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-07HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-06HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-06HouseH06 - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
2019-02-05HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2019-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-25Senate3rd Reading:Passed 27-1-2-0-0
2019-01-24Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-23SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-22SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-22SenateS06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-0-1-0
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2019-01-16SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-15 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback