IL SB2703 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. In provisions concerning the Historic Residence Assessment Freeze Law, provides that the fair cash value of the property shall be based on the final determination by the assessment officer, board of review, Property Tax Appeal Board, or court. Provides that, after the expiration of the 8-year valuation period, if the current fair cash value is less than the adjusted base year valuation, then the assessment shall be based on the current fair cash value. Provides that these changes are declarative of existing law.
Title
PROP TX-HISTORIC RESIDENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-26 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024 |
2024-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-004-000 |
2024-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2024-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-05-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-05-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-05-03 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 10-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 10-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |