WY SF0092 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-17-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-17-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to publicly funded hospitals; requiring approval of county commissioners for hospital operation as specified; requiring approval of county commissioners for tax exempt status of hospitals as specified; specifying applicability; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public hospitals-out of county operations.
Sponsors
Rep. Lloyd Larsen [R] | Sen. Dan Laursen [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Tom James [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Failed 12-17-1-0-0 (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Failed 12-17-1-0-0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-10 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |