WY SF0092 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 164 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Chapter No. 164 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to fire protection; authorizing local governmental entities to assume sole plan review authority; permitting assistance by the state fire marshal; making conforming amendments; clarifying cross references related to enforcement, inspections, plan review authority and appeals; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Local governments-plan review authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] | Sen. Larry Hicks [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Rep. James Byrd [D] | Rep. Roy Edwards [R] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] | Rep. Patrick Sweeney [R] |
Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Chapter No. 164 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-08 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0073 | |
2017-03-03 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0073 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0073 |
2017-03-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0073 | |
2017-03-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 56-2-2-0-0 |
2017-02-28 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-27 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-14 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2017-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-19 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-18 | Senate | S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-16 | Bill Number Assigned |