WY SF0090 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; authorizing the establishment of a local government investment equities pool; authorizing the investment of local government funds in equities; specifying duties for the state treasurer and state treasurer's office; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State-managed local government equity investment pool.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Byron [R] | Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Cale Case [R] |
Sen. Michael Gierau [D] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Concur:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-1-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-4-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 83 | |
2024-03-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0064 | |
2024-03-08 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0064 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0064 |
2024-03-08 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0064 | |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Concur:Passed 21-10-0-0-0 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2024-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 44-18-0-0-0 |
2024-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-03-01 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-03-01 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 27-3-1-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-14 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 27-4-0-0-0 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |