WY SF0089 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to adult protective services; amending and creating definitions; specifying that the department of family services shall not act as a caregiver as specified; requiring the department to pay specified costs; clarifying circumstances under which the department shall not be required to pay costs; amending services the department may be ordered by a court to provide; waiving a notification requirement as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Adult protective services.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Gingery [R] | Sen. Tony Ross [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] | Rep. Mary Throne [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - S01 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-24 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0047 | |
2011-02-22 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0047 | |
2011-02-22 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0047 | |
2011-02-22 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0047 | |
2011-02-22 | (S) Did Concur | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-09 | (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H01 | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-02-01 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-26 | (S01) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-12 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S01 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |