WY SF0086 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - No report prior to CoW Cutoff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicle licenses; creating a restricted driver's license for participants in 24/7 programs; providing additional driving privilege sanctions for driving while under the influence convictions and penalties for violations; providing an alternative to required ignition interlock devices; modifying when ignition interlock devices are required; clarifying credit for time spent on interlock devices; amending provisions relating to persons prohibited from driving without an interlock device and penalties; creating an account; repealing the sunset date for the 24/7 program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
DUI recidivism reduction-driving privilege sanctions.
Sponsors
Sen. David Kinskey [R] | Sen. Fred Baldwin [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] |
Rep. William Pownall [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2018-03-01 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2018-02-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-23 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-19 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 29-0-1-0-0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-12 | Bill Number Assigned |