WY SF0085 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 176 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Long Term Care Choices Act; amending criteria for licensing of adult foster care pilot projects; conforming definitions; amending criteria for the adult foster care pilot program; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult foster care pilot project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Concur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 176 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0080
2015-03-05HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0080
2015-03-05SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0080
2015-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0080
2015-03-04SenateConcur:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
2015-03-04SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-03-04House3rd Reading:Passed 59-0-1-0-0
2015-03-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-26 Labor:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2015-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
2015-01-27HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-27Senate3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
2015-01-26Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-23SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-21SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-21 Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
2015-01-19SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-16 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback