WY SF0084 | 2012 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-06 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to counties; providing for a board of county commissioners to be deemed to have special expertise on all issues on which they are granted statutory authority as specified; providing that a board of county commissioners may represent a county in federal land planning decisions as a cooperating agency with special expertise; providing conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
County commissions-special expertise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - H09 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2012-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA0015 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0015 | |
2012-03-02 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0015 | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned Number SEA0015 | |
2012-03-02 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-03-01 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-29 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-29 | (H09) Recommended Do Pass | |
2012-02-28 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H09 | |
2012-02-27 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-24 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-02-23 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-02-23 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2012-02-22 | Amendment Adopted | |
2012-02-22 | (S) Amendments Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2012-02-20 | (S09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2012-02-16 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S09 | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Number Assigned |