WY SF0081 | 2020 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Assigned Chapter Number 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to brands; amending provisions related to the rerecording of brands; authorizing the extension of the rerecording period for up to one hundred years; amending the recording fee; providing for notice of continuation; repealing the provision for permanently recorded brands; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Livestock brand administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 40-12-8-0-0 (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-14 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Assigned Chapter Number 76 | |
2020-03-12 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0034 | |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0034 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0034 |
2020-03-06 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0034 | |
2020-03-06 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 40-12-8-0-0 |
2020-03-05 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-03-04 | House | COW:Passed |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on General File |
2020-03-03 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-27 | House | H05 - Agriculture:Do Pass Failed 4-5-0-0-0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture |
2020-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2020-02-12 | Senate | S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-2-0-0-0 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 28-0-2-0-0 |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2020-02-05 | Bill Number Assigned |