WY SF0081 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Chapter No. 62 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to school capital construction; clarifying payment for charter school leases as specified; specifying a maximum payment for facilities leased by charter schools; clarifying exclusion of leased facilities for major maintenance payments as specified; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School capital construction-charter school leases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-07 Chapter No. 62 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-07 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-04 Governor Signed SEA No. 0033
2016-03-02HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0033
2016-03-02SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0033
2016-03-02 Assigned Number SEA No. 0033
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 49-10-1-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-25HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-25 H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2016-02-19HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2016-02-18HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-17Senate3rd Reading:Passed 18-12-0-0-0
2016-02-16Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-15SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-12SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-12 S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education 30-0-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback