WY SF0081 | 2012 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-02 - (H) Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to Medicaid; creating the Wyoming Medicaid False Claims Act; authorizing civil recoveries for the state as specified; prescribing duties of the attorney general; providing procedures; providing for a limitations period and applicability of the act; providing definitions; prescribing criminal penalties as specified for failure to maintain required records; creating a cause of action for retaliatory employment actions; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid fraud recovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-02 - House - H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S01 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-02 (H) Placed on General File; Did not Consider in COW
2012-03-02 (H01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-29 (H) Introduced and Referred to H01
2012-02-29 (H) Received for Introduction
2012-02-28 (S) Passed 3rd Reading
2012-02-27 (S) Passed 2nd Reading
2012-02-24 (S) Passed CoW
2012-02-24 Amendment Adopted
2012-02-24 (S) Amendments Adopted
2012-02-22 (S) Placed on General File
2012-02-22 (S01) Recommended Amend and Do Pass
2012-02-16 (S) Introduced and Referred to S01
2012-02-15 (S) Received for Introduction
2012-02-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback