WY SF0081 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-22 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water development projects; providing for construction of dams and reservoirs; authorizing construction of designated water projects; describing projects; specifying terms and conditions of funding for projects; providing appropriations; modifying project descriptions and terms of appropriations for various specified prior projects; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Omnibus water bill-construction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2011-02-22 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0035 | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0035 | |
2011-02-16 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0035 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0035 | |
2011-02-16 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-02-14 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-11 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2011-02-10 | (H05) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-02-01 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H05 | |
2011-01-26 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-26 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-01-25 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-21 | (S05) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S05 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0081.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0081.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Enroll/SF0081.pdf |