WY SF0080 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Assigned Chapter Number 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles; providing for enforcement of violations related to passing a stopped school bus; clarifying access to and the use of recordings from video systems installed on a school bus; providing a fine for vehicles passing a stopped school bus; providing defenses; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Passing stopped school bus-recorded images.
Sponsors
Rep. Landon Brown [R] | Rep. David Northrup [R] | Sen. Henry Coe [R] | Sen. Affie Ellis [R] |
Sen. Jeff Wasserburger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Concur:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-20-4-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 36-20-4-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-11 - Senate - S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | Assigned Chapter Number 74 | |
2019-02-26 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0042 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0042 |
2019-02-19 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0042 | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Concur:Passed 18-11-1-0-0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2019-02-15 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 36-20-4-0-0 |
2019-02-14 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-02-13 | House | COW:Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Placed on General File |
2019-02-12 | House | H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education |
2019-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-15 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 22-8-0-0-0 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2019-01-11 | Senate | S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2019-01-10 | Bill Number Assigned |