WY SF0080 | 2016 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to water; authorizing the use of produced water outside the state as specified; providing rulemaking authority; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Water use outside the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 | |
2016-02-19 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture 30-0-0-0-0 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2016-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0080.pdf |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Introduced/SF0080.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2016/Digest/SF0080.pdf |