WY SF0078 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Assigned Chapter Number 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to real estate appraisers; amending continuing education hours requirements; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Real estate appraisers-continuing education.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelly Duncan [R] | Rep. Dan Zwonitzer [R] | Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Sen. Stephan Pappas [R] | Sen. Wendy Davis Schuler [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - House - H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-12 - Senate - S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Assigned Chapter Number 129 | |
2021-04-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0051 | |
2021-04-02 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0051 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0051 |
2021-04-01 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0051 | |
2021-04-01 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2021-03-31 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | COW:Passed |
2021-03-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2021-03-26 | House | H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-24 | House | Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations |
2021-03-22 | House | Received for Introduction |
2021-03-22 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2021-03-12 | Senate | S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2021-01-29 | Bill Number Assigned |