WY SF0074 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Chapter No. 188 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to supplemental at-risk financial assistance for summer school and extended day programs; clarifying the availability of funds; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Summer school intervention and remediation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0 (Y: 43 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0 (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12 Chapter No. 188 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
2015-03-12 Assigned Chapter Number
2015-03-12 Governor Signed SEA No. 0068
2015-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0068
2015-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0068
2015-03-04 Assigned Number SEA No. 0068
2015-03-04House3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0
2015-03-03House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-03-02HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-26 Education:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2015-02-18HouseIntroduced and Referred to H04 - Education
2015-01-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 26-3-1-0-0
2015-01-21Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-20SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-19SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-19 Education:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-15SenateIntroduced and Referred to S04 - Education
2015-01-14SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-14 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback