WY SF0072 | 2016 | Budget Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Passed on March 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-16 - Chapter No. 114 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to highways; increasing the maximum speed limit on state highways as specified; amending penalties and weight limitations for violations of speed limits on state highways; amending assessment of court costs for violations of speed limits as specified; repealing a provision relating to violations of speed limits; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seventy miles per hour speed limit-state highways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Concur:Passed 26-4-0-0-0 (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-16-3-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 41-16-3-0-0 (Y: 41 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16 Chapter No. 114 Session Laws of Wyoming 2016
2016-03-16 Assigned Chapter Number
2016-03-15 Governor Signed SEA No. 0053
2016-03-04HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0053
2016-03-04SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0053
2016-03-03 Assigned Number SEA No. 0053
2016-03-03SenateConcur:Passed 26-4-0-0-0
2016-03-03SenateReceived for Concurrence
2016-03-02House3rd Reading:Passed 41-16-3-0-0
2016-03-01House2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-29HouseCOW:Passed
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2016-02-26HouseCOW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2016-02-26HousePlaced on General File
2016-02-26 H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
2016-02-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
2016-02-22HouseReceived for Introduction
2016-02-22Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
2016-02-19Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Passed
2016-02-18SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-18 S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2016-02-18SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2016-02-18SenatePlaced on General File
2016-02-18 S09 - Minerals:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2016-02-11SenateIntroduced and Referred to S09 - Minerals 29-1-0-0-0
2016-02-10SenateReceived for Introduction
2016-02-09 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback