WY SF0070 | 2024 | Budget Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H: Request for return of Bill from Senate pursuant to JR 19-1 Failed 28-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - H: Request for return of Bill from Senate pursuant to JR 19-1 Failed 28-33-1-0-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public funds; amending specified statutory funds to remove their inviolate status in order to enhance their investment potential; establishing spending policies for specified statutory funds; providing for the investment of specified statutory funds; redirecting the deposit of investment earnings into the corpuses of specified statutory funds; removing specified statutory funds from the pool A investment account; making conforming amendments; repealing inconsistent statutory provisions; repealing obsolete statutory provisions; providing for the treatment of prior deposits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Investment modernization-state nonpermanent funds-2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-05 - House - H: Request for return of Bill from Senate pursuant to JR 19-1 Failed 28-33-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 36-24-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - 3rd Reading:Failed 36-24-2-0-0 (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | H: Request for return of Bill from Senate pursuant to JR 19-1 Failed 28-33-1-0-0 |
2024-03-04 | House | 3rd Reading:Failed 36-24-2-0-0 |
2024-03-01 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-29 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2024-02-28 | House | COW:Passed |
2024-02-27 | House | Placed on General File |
2024-02-27 | House | H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-26 | House | Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations |
2024-02-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2024-02-14 | Senate | S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations 31-0-0-0-0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2024-02-02 | Bill Number Assigned |