WY SF0069 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-21 - Assigned Chapter Number 55
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to courts; providing for the digitizing and retention of court records as specified; striking obsolete language; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electronic records retention.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Crago [R] | Rep. Jared Olsen [R] | Rep. Karlee Provenza [D] | Sen. Dan Furphy [R] |
Sen. Bill Landen [R] | Sen. Tara Nethercott [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-16 - Senate - S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-21 | Assigned Chapter Number 55 | |
2023-02-21 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0033 | |
2023-02-16 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0033 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0033 |
2023-02-16 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0033 | |
2023-02-16 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 62-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-15 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-14 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-13 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-13 | House | H01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-1-0-0 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-16 | Senate | S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-29 | Bill Number Assigned |