WY SF0066 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number 182
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the livestock board; creating a livestock law enforcement account to reimburse county sheriffs for eligible expenses and to conduct training as specified; requiring promulgation of rules; providing an appropriation; requiring a report; and providing for effective dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock enforcement-reimbursement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0 (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - H05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Senate - S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Assigned Chapter Number 182
2019-03-08 Governor Signed SEA No. 0069
2019-02-27HouseSpeaker Signed SEA No. 0069
2019-02-27SenatePresident Signed SEA No. 0069
2019-02-26 Assigned Number SEA No. 0069
2019-02-26SenateConcur:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-02-26SenateReceived for Concurrence
2019-02-25House3rd Reading:Passed 51-8-1-0-0
2019-02-22House3rd Reading:Laid Back
2019-02-21House2nd Reading:Passed
2019-02-20HouseCOW:Passed
2019-02-15HousePlaced on General File
2019-02-15HouseH02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
2019-02-12House:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
2019-02-12HouseH05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 8-0-1-0-0
2019-02-01HouseIntroduced and Referred to H05 - Agriculture
2019-01-28HouseReceived for Introduction
2019-01-24Senate3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
2019-01-23Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2019-01-22SenateCOW:Passed
2019-01-18SenatePlaced on General File
2019-01-18SenateS02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-16Senate:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2019-01-16SenateS05 - Agriculture:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
2019-01-09SenateReceived for Introduction
2019-01-08 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback