WY SF0066 | 2010 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-08 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to industrial siting; amending jurisdictional criteria; amending and adding definitions; expanding and modifying notice provisions; granting rulemaking authority as specified; modifying the information necessary in permit and waiver applications; expanding the number of state agencies involved in permitting; specifying additional issues to consider in the permitting process; requiring additional fees; defining prohibited activities; modifying exempt facilities; providing exceptions to hearing requirements; providing additional requirements and jurisdiction for wind energy facilities; repealing laws regarding incomplete applications; making an appropriation; authorizing a position; conforming provisions; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Industrial siting amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Anderson [R] | Rep. Rodney Anderson [R] | Rep. Seth Carson [D] | Sen. Marty Martin [D] |
Sen. Drew Perkins [R] | Rep. William Steward [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - S Did Concur (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - Senate - S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S09 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2010-03-05 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0038 | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Speaker Signed SEA No. 0038 | |
2010-03-04 | (S) President Signed SEA No. 0038 | |
2010-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0038 | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Did Concur | |
2010-03-03 | (S) Received for Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-01 | (H) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-26 | (H02) Recommended Do Pass | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Rereferred to H02 | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-26 | (H09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Introduced and Referred to H09 | |
2010-02-23 | (H) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-22 | (S) Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-02-19 | (S) Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Passed CoW | |
2010-02-17 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-17 | (S02) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Rereferred to S02 | |
2010-02-15 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2010-02-15 | (S09) Recommended Amend and Do Pass | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S09 | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2010-02-08 | Bill Number Assigned |