WY SF0065 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to fire protection and electrical safety; amending requirements for the delegation of authority to municipalities and counties to enforce and interpret local or state fire building and electrical safety standards as specified; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electrical safety enforcement-amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-5-0-0-0 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | No report prior to CoW Cutoff |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary 25-5-0-0-0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-02-09 | Bill Number Assigned |