WY SF0063 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Assigned Chapter Number 33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation and revenue; clarifying the administration of certain taxes by the department of revenue; providing that the department of revenue may credit or waive interest related to mine product taxes; providing that any assessment or levy of sales and use taxes resulting from an audit or review shall be issued within a specified time of the audit or review; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Tax administration revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-14 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Assigned Chapter Number 33 | |
2023-02-15 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0019 | |
2023-02-14 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0019 |
2023-02-14 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0019 | |
2023-02-14 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 61-0-1-0-0 |
2023-02-13 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-02-10 | House | COW:Passed |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on General File |
2023-02-09 | House | H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2023-02-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue |
2023-01-17 | House | Received for Introduction |
2023-01-17 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 31-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2023-01-13 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2023-01-13 | Senate | S03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue |
2022-12-28 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2022-12-15 | Bill Number Assigned |