WY SF0063 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 108 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-06 - Chapter No. 108 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the department of family services; amending statutes and programs related to the department of family services; amending registry requirements related to child and adult protection reports; abolishing the skills training center pilot program; making the operation of adult student financial aid programs contingent upon available funding; amending the low income home energy assistance program; amending eligibility verification processes related to public welfare benefits; updating obsolete references; repealing obsolete language; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Department of family services-statutory amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-13 - Senate - S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | Chapter No. 108 Session Laws of Wyoming 2017 | |
2017-03-06 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2017-03-06 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0043 | |
2017-02-27 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0043 |
2017-02-27 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0043 |
2017-02-24 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0043 | |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Concur:Passed 28-1-1-0-0 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received for Concurrence |
2017-02-22 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0 |
2017-02-21 | House | 3rd Reading:Laid Back |
2017-02-16 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | COW:Passed |
2017-02-10 | House | Placed on General File |
2017-02-10 | House | H10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 |
2017-02-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor |
2017-01-23 | House | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-18 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2017-01-16 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2017-01-13 | Senate | S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2017-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |