WY SF0063 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to predatory animals; prohibiting ownership of a predator without a permit; providing a definition; providing rulemaking authority; providing a penalty; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Predator ownership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Concur:Failed 13-17-0-0-0 (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0 (Y: 37 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-6-1-0-0 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-6-1-0 (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 23-6-1-0 (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-09Senatepostponed indefinitely
2015-03-06SenateAdopt JCC #1
2015-02-26HouseAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-24SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-23SenateAppointed JCC01 Members
2015-02-23SenateConcur:Failed 13-17-0-0-0
2015-02-20SenateReceived for Concurrence
2015-02-20House3rd Reading:Passed 37-22-1-0-0
2015-02-19House2nd Reading:Passed
2015-02-18HouseCOW:Passed
2015-02-11HousePlaced on General File
2015-02-11 Travel:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
2015-02-09HouseIntroduced and Referred to H06 - Travel
2015-01-29HouseReceived for Introduction
2015-01-28Senate3rd Reading:Passed 23-6-1-0-0
2015-01-27Senate2nd Reading:Passed
2015-01-26SenateCOW:Passed
2015-01-26SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-26 Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
2015-01-22SenateCOW:Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
2015-01-22SenatePlaced on General File
2015-01-22 Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
2015-01-14SenateIntroduced and Referred to S06 - Travel
2015-01-13SenateReceived for Introduction
2015-01-12 Bill Number Assigned

Wyoming State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback