WY SF0061 | 2018 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to hunting; specifying that hunters can wear fluorescent pink when hunting big or trophy game animals; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hunting colors-fluorescent pink.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - House - 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 (Y: 39 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 27-3-0-0-0 (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-16 | Chapter No. 105 Session Laws of Wyoming 2018 | |
2018-03-16 | Governor Signed SEA No. 0057 | |
2018-03-16 | Assigned Chapter Number 105 | |
2018-03-10 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0057 |
2018-03-09 | Assigned Number SEA No. 0057 | |
2018-03-09 | House | 3rd Reading:Passed 39-21-0-0-0 |
2018-03-08 | House | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | 2nd Reading:Laid Back |
2018-03-06 | House | COW:Passed |
2018-03-05 | House | Placed on General File |
2018-03-05 | House | H06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0 |
2018-03-02 | House | Introduced and Referred to H06 - Travel |
2018-02-19 | House | Received for Introduction |
2018-02-19 | Senate | 3rd Reading:Passed 29-1-0-0-0 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | 2nd Reading:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | COW:Passed |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S06 - Travel:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S06 - Travel 27-3-0-0-0 |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2018-01-25 | Bill Number Assigned |