WY SF0061 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-26 - (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to workers' compensation; amending the standard for tort immunity for an injured worker's fellow employees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Co-employee immunity.
Sponsors
Sen. Eli Bebout [R] | Rep. Tim Stubson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-01-26 - Senate - S Failed CoW; Indef Postponed (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-14 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-14 - Senate - S10 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-26 | (S) Failed CoW; Indef Postponed | |
2011-01-14 | (S) Placed on General File | |
2011-01-14 | (S10) Recommended Do Pass | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Introduced and Referred to S10 | |
2011-01-11 | (S) Received for Introduction | |
2011-01-05 | Bill Number Assigned |
Wyoming State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0061.htm |
Text | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Introduced/SF0061.pdf |
Roll Call | http://legisweb.state.wy.us/2011/Digest/SF0061.htm |