WY SF0059 | 2014 | Budget Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned Chapter Number
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to highway signage; amending statutes related to the Wyoming department of transportation's program for specific service signage; allowing a competitive bid process for contracted construction, erection and maintenance of the program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Specific service signage on highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - H Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - H08 Recommended Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - S Passed 3rd Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - Senate - S Introduced and Referred to S08 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assigned Chapter Number | |
2014-03-10 | Governor Signed SEA0036 | |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker Signed SEA No. 0036 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President Signed SEA No. 0036 |
2014-03-03 | Assigned Number SEA0036 | |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed CoW |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on General File |
2014-02-26 | House | Recommended Do Pass |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to H08 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received for Introduction |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed CoW |
2014-02-13 | Amendment Adopted | |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Amendments Adopted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on General File |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommended Amend and Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to S08 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Received for Introduction |
2014-01-21 | Bill Number Assigned |